Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-956
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-956
Title:Google LLC, Petitioner
v.
Oracle America, Inc.
Docketed:January 25, 2019
Linked with 18A417
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1118, 2017-1202)
   Decision Date:March 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 28, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 19 2018Application (18A417) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2018 to January 25, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 23 2018Application (18A417) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 25, 2019.
Jan 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 25, 2019 to March 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 27, 2019.
Feb 15 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Google LLC.
Blanket Consent
Feb 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Developers Alliance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Eight Intellectual Property Scholars filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Amicus brief of Computer & Communications Industry Association not accepted for filing. (February 25, 2019) (Corrected electronic filing submitted)
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Microsoft Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of R Street Institute and Public Knowledge filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors Peter S. Menell and David Nimmer filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Sixty Five Intellectual Property Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Computer & Communications Industry Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 78 Computer Scientists.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Antitrust Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Engine Advocacy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Python Software Foundation and Tidelift filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Software Innovators, Startups, and Investors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Mozilla Corp., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 25 2019Amicus brief of Red Hat, Inc. not accepted for filing. (March 11, 2019)(Corrected version submitted).
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Red Hat, Inc. filed.(3/11/2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2019Brief of respondent Oracle America, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019.
Apr 10 2019Reply of petitioner Google LLC, filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Sep 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 16 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 16 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Google LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 15 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 78 Computer Scientists GRANTED.
Nov 15 2019Petition GRANTED.
Nov 22 2019Letter requesting permission to file the joint appendix under the deferred method filed.
Main Document
Dec 05 2019The Clerk has approved the deferred method for filing of the joint appendix per Rule 26.4.
Dec 05 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Dec 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 6, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including February 12, 2020.
Dec 16 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Google LLC. (Statement of cost filed).
Blanket Consent
Jan 06 2020Brief of petitioner Google LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Civ Pro, IP & Legal History Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Glynn Lunney filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Michael Risch filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Center for Democracy and Technology, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Peter S. Menell, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Copyright Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Rimini Street, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of The Robert Rauschenberg Foundation et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Computer & Communications Industry Association and Internet Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Developers Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Microsoft Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of International Business Machines Corp. et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Small, Medium, and Open Source Technology Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Auto Care Association and Static Control Components, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Python Software Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Eighty Three Computer Scientists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of R Street Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Engine Advocacy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Seventy Two Intellectual Property Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Antitrust Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Software and System Developers and Engineers for United States Government Agencies filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Software Innovators, Startups, and Investors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Amicus brief of Software Freedom Law Center not accepted for filing. (January 28, 2020)
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Software Freedom Law Center filed. (1/17/2020)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of The American Library Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Empirical Legal Researchers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 24, 2020.
Feb 12 2020Brief of respondent Oracle America, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Interdisciplinary Research Team on Programmer Creativity filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2020Brief amicus curiae of The American Conservative Union Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2020Brief amicus curiae of Internet Accountability Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Copyright Thought Leaders filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Helienne Lindvall, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit.
Feb 19 2020CIRCULATED
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Synopsys, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Motion Picture Association, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Ralph Oman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Legislative Exchange Council filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor and Former CONTU Member Arthur R. Miller filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Copyright Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Dolby Labratories, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Mathworks, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of SAS Institute Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Alliance of U.S. Startups and Inventors for Jobs ("USIJ") filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Industry Executives Joseph M. Tucci and Paul T. Dacier filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Digital Justice Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Ten Creators' Rights Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Professor Eugene H. Spafford, PH.D., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Congressmen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of News Media Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Association of American Publishers, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Committee for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Nine Professors and Scholars of Intellectual Property Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Consumers' Research filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amici curiae of The Recording Industry Association of America, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amici curiae of 25 Professors of Journalism and Media Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Medicine in the Public Interest filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of USTelecom – The Broadband Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Hudson Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Former SUN Executive Scott McNealy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2020Joint appendix (2 volumes & 1 supplemental) filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
Feb 26 202010 poster size copies received of page 1 of the trial exhibit 1028 see SJA3.
Mar 02 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Mar 03 2020The record is available on PACER.
Mar 10 2020Confidential record material from the USCA Federal Circuit electronically received.
Mar 11 2020Reply of petitioner Google LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Google LLC
Kannon K. ShanmugamPaul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Google LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Oracle America, Inc.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
David L. Applegate
    Counsel of Record
Williams Montgomery & John Ltd.
6800 Willis Tower
233 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

dla@willmont.com
312.443.3200
Party name: The American Conservative Union Foundation
Jonathan Band
    Counsel of Record
Jonathan Band PLLC
21 Dupont Circle NW Suite 800
Washington, DC 20036

jband@policybandwidth.com
202-296-5675
Party name: Computer & Communications Industry Association and Internet Association
Michael Barclay
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

michael@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Christopher Theodore Bavitz
    Counsel of Record
Cyberlaw Clinic, Harvard Law School
1585 Massachusetts, Ave, Suite WCC 5018
Cambridge, MA 02138

cbavitz@law.harvard.edu
6174965155
Party name: Eight Intellectual Property Scholars
Garrard Russ Beeney
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan and Cromwell LLP
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

beeneyg@sullcrom.com
212 558 3737
Party name: Dolby Labratories, Inc.
Elizabeth Rogers Brannen
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher LLP
777 S. Figueroa St.
Ste. 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

elizabeth.brannen@strismaher.com
(213) 995-6800
Party name: SAS Institute Inc.
Andrew Phillip Bridges
    Counsel of Record
Fenwick & West, LLP
801 California Street
Silicon Valley Center
Mountain View, CA 94041

abridges@fenwick.com
(415) 875-2389
Party name: Software and System Developers and Engineers for United States Government Agencies
Daniel J. Brooks
    Counsel of Record
Scarola Zubatov Schaffzin PLLC
1700 Broadway
41st Floor
New York, NY 10019

dbrooks@szslaw.com
(212) 757-0007
Party name: 25 Professors of Journalism and Media Law
Brandon Collins Butler
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia
PO Box 400152
Charlottesville, VA 22904

bcb4y@virginia.edu
434-982-5874
Party name: The American Library Association, The Association Of Research Libraries, The Association Of College And Research Libraries, And The Software Preservation Network
Anne Marie Cappella
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
201 Redwood Shores Parkway
Redwood Shores, CA 94065

anne.cappella@weil.com
650-802-3141
Party name: Professor Eugene H. Spafford, PH.D., Professor Zhi Ding, PH.D., Professor Emeritus Lee A. Hollar., PH.D., Professor Adam Porter, PH.D., and Mr. Peter Kent, BSC,
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Software Innovators, Startups, and Investors
Jaclyn Fabean Cherry
    Counsel of Record
University of South Carolina School of Law
1525 Senate Street
Columbia, SC 29208

Cherryja@law.sc.edu
803-777-3394
Party name: Civ Pro, IP & Legal History Professors in Support of Petitioner
Ralph D. Clifford
    Counsel of Record
University of Massachusetts School of Law
333 Faunce Corner Road
Dartmouth, MA 02747

rclifford@rcn.com
508-985-1137
Party name: Interdisciplinary Research Team on Programmer Creativity
Catherine Newby Crump
    Counsel of Record
Samuelson Clinic for Law, Technology & Public Policy
University of California, Berkeley, School of Law
353 Boalt Hall
Berkely, CA 94720

ccrump@law.berkeley.edu
5102926860
Party name: Seventy Two Intellectual Property Scholars
Edward Francis Cunningham
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Edward F. Cunningham
62 Cambridge Avenue
Garden City, NY 11530

ed@edcunninghamlaw.com
5163283705
Party name: Digital Justice Foundation
James Wilson Dabney
    Counsel of Record
Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP
One Battery Park Plaza
New York, NY 10004

james.dabney@hugheshubbard.com
2128376803
Party name: International Business Machines Corp. and Red Hat, Inc.
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

supremecourt.gov@cduan.com
(202) 525-5717
Party name: R Street Institute and Public Knowledge
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: The Mathworks, Inc.
Robert S. Friedman
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
30 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10112

rfriedman@sheppardmullin.com
(212) 653-8700
Party name: Nine Professors and Scholars on Intellectual Property Law
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6869
Party name: Copyright Alliance
Joseph Charles Gratz
    Counsel of Record
Durie Tangri LLP
217 Leidesdorff Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

jgratz@durietangri.com
415-362-6666
Party name: Center for Democracy and Technology, Institute For Intellectual Property & Social Justice, National Consumers League, and National Federation of the Blind
Seth D. Greenstein
    Counsel of Record
Constantine Cannon LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 1300 North
Washington, DC 20004

sgreenstein@constantinecannon.com
202-204-3514
Party name: Auto Care Association and Static Control Components, Inc.
Russell Paul Hanser
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Barker Knauer, LLP
1800 M Street, NW, Suite 800N
Washington, DC 20036

rhanser@wbklaw.com
202-383-3408
Party name: USTelecom – The Broadband Association
Jonathon Paul Hauenschild
    Counsel of Record
American Legislative Exchange Council
2900 Crystal Dr., Ste. 600
Arlington, VA 22202

jhauenschild@alec.org
7033730933
Party name: American Legislative Exchange Council
Ian Marc Herman
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP
150 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017

elie.herman@wilsonelser.com
2129155724
Party name: Empirical Legal Researchers
James Harold Hulme
    Counsel of Record
Arent Fox LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006-5344

james.hulme@arentfox.com
2028576144
Party name: Developers Alliance
William A. Isaacson
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

wisaacson@bsfllp.com
2022372727
Party name: Former Congressmen
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-415-7412
Party name: Hudson Institute
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Synopsys, Inc.
Celeste Lidwina Maria Koeleveld
    Counsel of Record
Clifford Chance US LLP
31 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10025

celeste.koeleveld@cliffordchance.com
212 878-8000
Party name: Former SUN Executive Scott McNealy
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
Mololamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
202-556-2000
Party name: Microsoft Corporation
Marc Robert Lewis
    Counsel of Record
Lewis & Llewellyn LLP
601 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000
San Francisco, CA 94111

mlewis@lewisllewellyn.com
4158000591
Party name: Ralph Oman
Robert P. LoBue
    Counsel of Record
Patterson, Belknap, Webb et al
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

rplobue@pbwt.com
2123362000
Party name: NEWS MEDIA ALLIANCE
Joseph Glynn Stephen Lunney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Texas A&M University School of Law
1515 Commerce Street
FORT WORTH, TX 76102-6509

glunney@law.tamu.edu
8172123932
Party name: Glynn Lunney
Phillip Robert Malone
    Counsel of Record
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Clinic
Mills Legal Clinic at Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

pmalone@law.stanford.edu
650-725-6369
Party name: Eighty Three Computer Scientists
Jonathan S. Massey
    Counsel of Record
Massey & Gail LLP
1000 Maine Avenue SW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20024

jmassey@masseygail.com
202-652-4511
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Consumers' Research
Peter S. Menell
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
225 Bancroft Way
Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

pmenell@law.berkeley.edu
5106425489
Party name: Professors Peter S. Menell, David Nimmer and Shyamkrishna Balganesh
Eben Moglen
    Counsel of Record
Columbia Law School
435 West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027

moglen@columbia.edu
(212) 854-8382
Party name: Software Freedom Law Center
Jennifer Librach Nall
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard, Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701

jennifer.nall@bakerbotts.com
5123222507
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Maria Ann Pallante-Hyun
    Counsel of Record
Association of American Publishers
455 Massachusetts Ave. NW, Suite 700
Washington, DC 20001

mpallante@publishers.org
202-347-3375
Party name: The Association of American Publishers, Inc.
Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
    Counsel of Record
IP & Technology Law Clinic, USC Gould School of Law
699 Exposition Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90089-0071

jef@law.usc.edu
213-740-7088
Party name: Engine Advocacy
Edward A. Pennington
    Counsel of Record
Murphy and King
1055 Thomas Jefferson Street NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20007

epennington@sgrlaw.com
202-263-4307
Party name: Center for Medicine in the Public Interest
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: Rimini Street, Inc.
Michael Victor Risch
    Counsel of Record
Villanova University Charles Widger School of Law
299 N. Spring Mill Rd.
Villanova, PA 19085

mrisch@alumni.stanford.edu
6504442238
Party name: Michael Risch
Robert H. Rotstein
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
2049 Century Park East 18th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

rxr@msk.com
310-312-3203
Party name: Motion Picture Association, Inc.
Charles J. Sanders
    Counsel of Record
29 Kings Grant Way
Briarcliff, NY 10510

csanderslaw@aol.com
9145887231
Party name: Helienne Lindvall, et al.
John Paul Schnapper-Casteras
    Counsel of Record
Schnapper-Casteras PLLC
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

jpsc@schnappercasteras.com
2026303644
Party name: The Robert Rauschenberg Foundation et al.
Jason M. Schultz
    Counsel of Record
New York University School of Law
245 Sullivan Street
Room 609
New York, NY 10012

jason.schultz@law.nyu.edu
212-992-7365
Party name: Small, Medium, and Open Source Technology Organizations
Jason M. Schultz
    Counsel of Record
New York University School of Law
245 Sullivan Street
Room 609
New York, NY 10012

jason.schultz@law.nyu.edu
510-390-0237
Party name: Mozilla Corp., et al.
Frank Phillip Scibilia
    Counsel of Record
Pryor Cashman LLP
7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

fscibilia@pryorcashman.com
212-326-0445
Party name: The Recording Industry Association of America, et al.
David William Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
The Norton Law Firm
299 Third Street, Suite 106
Oakland, CA 94607

dshapiro@nortonlaw.com
5109064906
Party name: Joseph M. Tucci and Paul T. Dacier
Theodore Stevenson III
    Counsel of Record
McKool Smith
300 Crescent Court
Suite 1500
Dallas, TX 75201

tstevenson@mckoolsmith.com
2149784974
Party name: Professor and Former CONTU Member Arthur R. Miller
Randy M. Stutz
    Counsel of Record
American Antitrust Institute
1025 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

rstutz@antitrustinstitute.org
2029055420
Party name: American Antitrust Institute
Robert P. Taylor
    Counsel of Record
RPT Legal Strategies PC
2443 Fillmore Street
#332
San Francisco, CA 94115

robert.taylor@rptstrategies.com
4154473975
Party name: Alliance of U.S. Startups and Inventors for Jobs ("USIJ")
Steven Marc Tepp
    Counsel of Record
George Washington University Law School
2000 H Street, NW
Washington, DC 20052

smtepp@law.gwu.edu
703-255-6032
Party name: Copyright Thought Leaders
John Thorne
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

jthorne@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7992
Party name: Internet Accountability Project
Rebecca Leah Tushnet
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School
1575 Massachusetts Ave.
Hauser 520
Cambridge, MA 02138

rtushnet@law.harvard.edu
7035936759
Party name: Copyright Scholars
Ryan Joseph Walsh
    Counsel of Record
Eimer Stahl LLP
10 East Doty Street
Madison, WI 53703

rwalsh@eimerstahl.com
(312) 660-7639
Party name: Committee for Justice
Jill Margaret Wheaton
    Counsel of Record
Dykema Gossett, PLLC
112E. Pecan St., #1800
San Antonio, TX 78215

jwheaton@dykema.com
210-554-5294
Party name: Python Software Foundation and Tidelift
Nancy E. Wolff
    Counsel of Record
Cowan, DeBaets, Abrahams & Sheppard LLP
41 Madison Avenue
38th Floor
New York, NY 10010

nwolff@cdas.com
2129747474
Party name: Ten Creators' Rights Organizations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543