Docket for 22-7046 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 03 2023 | Application (22A609) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2023 to March 18, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 10 2023 | Application (22A609) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 18, 2023. | | | Mar 17 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 20, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | Apr 10 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2023 to May 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2023. See Rule 30.1. | | | Apr 28 2023 | Suggestion of Death submitted. | | Main Document | Jan 18 2024 | Joint stipulation to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 filed. | | Main Document | Feb 02 2024 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. | | |
|