Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-1165
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-1165
Title:Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Moab Partners, L.P., et al.
Docketed:June 1, 2023
Linked with 22A920
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2524)
   Decision Date:December 20, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:January 27, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 14 2023Application (22A920) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 27, 2023 to May 30, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 24 2023Application (22A920) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 30, 2023.
May 30 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 3, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2023Waiver of right of respondent Barclays Capital Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 21 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 3, 2023 to August 2, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 22 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 2, 2023.
Jul 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 03 2023Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 26 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 2, 2023 to August 11, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 11, 2023.
Aug 11 2023Brief of respondent Moab Partners, L.P. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2023Reply of petitioners Macquarie Infrastructure Corp., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Sep 29 2023Petition GRANTED.
Nov 13 2023Brief of petitioners Macquarie Infrastructure Corp., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Nov 13 2023Brief of respondent Barclays Capital Inc. in support of vacatur filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 16, 2024.
Nov 20 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit.
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Society for Corporate Governance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2023Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. The record is electronic and is available with the Clerk.
Nov 30 2023CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

LCOBERLY@WINSTON.COM
312-558-5600
Party name: Macquarie Infrastructure Corp., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

DFREDERICK@KELLOGGHANSEN.COM
202-326-7900
Party name: Moab Partners, L.P.
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

KSHANMUGAM@PAULWEISS.COM
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Barclays Capital Inc.
William Thomas MarksPaul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

wmarks@paulweiss.com
202-223-7314
Party name: Barclays Capital Inc.
Other
Mary Jane Eaton
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP
601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022

mary.eaton@freshfields.com
(212) 277-4000
Party name: The Society for Corporate Governance
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJAY@GOODWINLAW.COM
2023464190
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, and Business Roundtable
Lyle Roberts
    Counsel of Record
Shearman & Sterling LLP
401 9th Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20004

lyle.roberts@shearman.com
202 508-8108
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543