Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-648
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-648
Title:Edward Hedican, Petitioner
v.
Walmart Stores East, L.P., et al.
Docketed:November 3, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1419)
   Decision Date:June 4, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 8, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2021Waiver of right of respondents Walmart Stores East, L.P. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 08 2021Waiver of right of respondent Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Nov 23 2021Response Requested. (Due December 23, 2021)
Dec 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 23, 2021 to January 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 24, 2022.
Dec 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 23, 2021 to January 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 24, 2022, for all respondents.
Dec 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 24 2022Brief of respondent Equal Employment Opportunity Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 24 2022Brief of respondents Walmart Stores East, L.P. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2022Reply of petitioner Edward Hedican filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 23 2022Rescheduled.
Feb 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 15 2022Supplemental brief of respondents Walmart Stores East, L.P. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 16 2022Supplemental brief of petitioner Edward Hedican filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 21 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Cameron v. EMW Women’s Surgical Center, P.S.C., 595 U. S. ___ (2022). .
Apr 22 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

erassbach@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: Edward Hedican
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeremy Michael Bylund
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding, LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

jbylund@kslaw.com
(202) 626-5455
Party name: Walmart Stores East, L.P. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Other
Bradley Jason Lingo
    Counsel of Record
Regent University School of Law
1000 Regent University Drive
Virginia Beach, VA 23464

blingo@regent.edu
757-352-4337
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543