SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-852
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-852
Title:
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jennifer VanDerStok, et al.
Docketed:
February 7, 2024
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(23-10718)
Decision Date:
November 9, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 07 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2024)
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Mar 07 2024
Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia, et al. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 07 2024
Brief of respondents Jennifer VanDerStok, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 08 2024
Brief of respondents Defense Distributed, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 08 2024
Brief amicus curiae of Gun Violence Protection Groups filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 27 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024.
Mar 27 2024
Reply of petitioners Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 15 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024.
Apr 22 2024
Petition GRANTED.
Apr 29 2024
Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Apr 29 2024
Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 25, 2024. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 13, 2024.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Charles Randall Flores
Counsel of Record
Flores Law PLLC
917 Franklin Street
Suite 600
Houston, TX 77002
cf@chadflores.law
713-364-6640
Party name: Defense Distributed; Polymer 80, Inc.; Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
David H. Thompson
Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036
DTHOMPSON@COOPERKIRK.COM
202-220-9600
Party name: Jennifer VanDerStok, Michael G. Andren, Tactical Machining, L.L.C., and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
Other
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
20th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111
KHARTNETT@COOLEY.COM
(415) 693-2000
Party name: Gun Violence Protection Groups
Caroline Sage Van Zile
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General for D.C.
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001
caroline.vanzile@dc.gov
(202) 724-6609
Party name: The District of Columbia, New Jersey, Pennsylvania, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##