Docket for 23-701
|
Dec 11 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due January 29, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word Count | Jan 02 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent International SOS Assistance, Inc., Dessi Nikolova, Gregory Harris, and Arnaud Vassie to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 03 2024 | Motion to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorar pursuant to Rule 46 filed by petitioner. | | Main Document | Jan 05 2024 | Waiver of right of respondents Access Staffing, LLC, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 07 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2024. | | | Feb 12 2024 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. | | |
|