Docket for 23-6383 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 09 2023 | Application (23A436) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 22, 2023 to January 21, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 16 2023 | Application (23A436) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 22, 2023. | | | Dec 22 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 29, 2024) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jan 26 2024 | Brief of respondent Florida, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 15 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2024. | | | Mar 04 2024 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|