Aug 22 2023 | Application (23A194) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 12, 2023 to November 11, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther |
Aug 30 2023 | Application (23A194) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 12, 2023. |
| |
Oct 12 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 16, 2023) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther |
Nov 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2023 to December 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Nov 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 15, 2023. |
| |
Dec 14 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2023 to January 16, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 16, 2024. |
| |
Jan 16 2024 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jan 26 2024 | Reply of petitioner Ramiro Felix Gonzales filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther |
Feb 01 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024. |
| |
Feb 06 2024 | Motion to defer consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner Ramiro Gonzales. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Feb 15 2024 | Response to motion to defer consideration from respondent filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Feb 20 2024 | Petition DENIED. |
| |