Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-175
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-175
Title:City of Grants Pass, Oregon, Petitioner
v.
Gloria Johnson, et al., on Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated
Docketed:August 25, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35752, 20-35881)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 5, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 22 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2023Brief amici curiae of Freddy Brown, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 19 2023Brief amici curiae of California State Association of Counties filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Waiver of right of respondent Gloria Johnson, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of District Attorney of Sacramento County filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives Ben Toma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2023Brief amici curiae of California State Sheriffs' Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation and California Business Properties Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Office of San Diego County District Attorney filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amici curiae of League of Oregon Cities, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of California Governor Gavin Newsom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Brentwood Community Council filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of City and County of San Francisco, et al. filed
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of LA Alliance for Human Rights, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Idaho, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Los Angeles Area Chamber of Commerce, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of Venice Stakeholders Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of City of Phoenix, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of City of Los Angeles filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of Washington State Association of Sheriffs and Police Chiefs filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Ten California Cities and The County of Orange filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Bay Area Council, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Neighbors for a Better San Francisco, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2023Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 05 2023Response Requested. (Due November 6, 2023)
Oct 10 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2023 to December 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 12 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 6, 2023.
Nov 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of City of Chico filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2023Brief of Gloria Johnson, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

TEVANGELIS@GIBSONDUNN.COM
(213) 229-7000
Party name: City of Grants Pass
Attorneys for Respondents
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

KBC74@GEORGETOWN.EDU
202-661-6728
Party name: Gloria Johnson, et al.
Edward Beman JohnsonOregon Law Center
522 SW Fifth Avenue. Suite 812
Portland, OR 97204

ejohnson@oregonlawcenter.org
503-998-2133
Party name: Gloria Johnson, et al.
Other
Eric Samuel Boorstin
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy, LLP
3601 W. Olive Avenue, 8th Floor
Burbank, CA 91505

eboorstin@horvitzlevy.com
8189950800
Party name: Los Angeles Area Chamber of Commerce and Central City Association of Los Angeles
David Ryan Carpenter
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
555 West Fifth Street, Suite 4000
Los Angeles, CA 90013

drcarpenter@sidley.com
213-896-6000
Party name: California Governor Gavin Newsom
David Carrillo Casarrubias
    Counsel of Record
Hanson Bridgett LLP
425 Market Street, 26th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

dcasarrubias@hansonbridgett.com
415-995-5893
Party name: Bay Area Council et al.
Fred D. Heather
    Counsel of Record
Glaser Weil Fink Jordan Avchen & Shapiro LLP
10250 Constellation Blvd.
19th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

fheather@glaserweil.com
310.553.3000
Party name: Brentwood Community Council
Jennifer Bacon Henning
    Counsel of Record
County Counsels' Association of California
1100 K Street, Suite 101
Sacramento, CA 95814

jhenning@counties.org
916-327-7535
Party name: California State Association of Counties
Tiffany Joy Israel
    Counsel of Record
Aleshire & Wynder LLP
1 Park Plaza. Suite 1000
Irvine, CA 92614

tisrael@awattorneys.com
(949) 223-1170
Party name: Ten California Cities and The County of Orange
Ronald Alan Jakob
    Counsel of Record
Office of the District Attorney
330 West Broadway
Suite 860
San Diego, CA 92101-3827

Ronald.Jakob@sdcda.org
619-531-3671
Party name: District Attorney of San Diego County
Anit Kumar Jindal
    Counsel of Record
Markowitz Herbold PC
1455 SW Broadway, Suite 1900
Portland, OR 97201

anitjindal@markowitzherbold.com
(503) 295-3085
Party name: League of Oregon Cities et al.
Jeffrey Lewis
    Counsel of Record
Jeff Lewis Law, APC
827 Deep Valley Drive
Suite 209
Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274

Jeff@JeffLewisLaw.com
(310) 935-4001
Party name: Venice Stakeholders Association
Albert Calvin Locher
    Counsel of Record
Sacramento County Dist.Attorney's Office
901 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

lochera@sacda.org
916-505-2492
Party name: District Attorney of Sacramento County
Robert E. Mack
    Counsel of Record
Smith Alling, P.S.
1501 Dock Street
Tacoma, WA 98402

rmack@smithalling.com
(253) 627-1091
Party name: Washington State Association of Sheriffs and Police Chiefs
Christopher George Michel
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
1300 I St. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

CHRISTOPHERMICHEL@QUINNEMANUEL.COM
2025388308
Party name: Neighbors for a Better San Francisco et al.
Mark Miller
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Blvd.
Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

mark@pacificlegal.org
916-503-9001
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation and California Business Properties Association
Justin Scott Pierce
    Counsel of Record
Pierce Coleman PLLC
7730 E. Greenway Road, Suite 105
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Justin@piercecoleman.com
(602) 772-5506
Party name: City of Phoenix & the League of Arizona Cities and Towns
Brandon Michael Rain
    Counsel of Record
Seattle City Attorney's Office
701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2050
Seattle, WA 98104

brandon.rain@seattle.gov
206-684-8200
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association, National League of Cities, National Association of Counties, North Dakota League of Cities, Cities of Albuquerque, Anchorage, Colorado Springs, Henderson, Las Vegas, Milwaukee, Providence, Redondo Beach, Saint Paul, San Diego, Seattle, Spokane, and Tacoma, the City and County of Honolulu, and the County of San Bernardino
Denise Lynn RocawichJones & Mayer
3777 N. Harbor Blvd.
Fullerton, CA 92835

dlr@jones-mayer.com
714446-1400
Party name: California State Sheriffs' Association, et al.
Brunn Wall Roysden III
    Counsel of Record
Fusion Law, PLLC
7600 N. 15th St., Suite 150
Phoenix, AZ 85020

beau@fusion.law
6023157545
Party name: Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives Ben Toma and President of the Arizona State Senate Warren Petersen
Eric Golas Salbert
    Counsel of Record
Alvarez-Glasman & Colvin
13181 Crossroads Parkway North - West Tower, Suite 400
City of Industry, CA 91746

esalbert@agclawfirm.com
562-699-5500
Party name: City of Chico
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

TSANDEFUR@GOLDWATERINSTITUTE.ORG
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Kent S. Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
Tara Michelle Steeley
    Counsel of Record
Office of the City Attorney
City Hall, Room 234, 1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett
San Francisco, CA 94102

Tara.steeley@sfcityatty.org
4155544655
Party name: City and County of San Francisco and Mayor London Breed
James R. Touchstone
    Counsel of Record
Jones & Mayer
3777 North Harbor Boulevard
Fullerton, CA 92835

jrt@jones-mayer.com
714-446-1400
Party name: California State Sheriffs' Association, et al.
Joshua Nathaniel Turner
    Counsel of Record
ldaho Attorney General's Office
700 W Jefferson Street
Boise, ID 83720

josh.turner@ag.idaho.gov
2083323548
Party name: States of Idaho, Montana, et. al.
Matthew Donald Umhofer
    Counsel of Record
Umhofer, Mitchell & King LLP
767 S. Alameda St.
Suite 270
Los Angeles, CA 90021

matthew@umklaw.com
213-394-7979
Party name: LA Alliance for Human Rights
Michael Martin Walsh
    Counsel of Record
City of Los Angeles, City Attorney
200 North Spring Street, 14th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90012

michael.walsh@lacity.org
(213) 978-2209
Party name: City of Los Angeles
Ilan Wurman
    Counsel of Record
Tully Bailey LLP
11811 N. Tatum Blvd. Suite 3031
Phoenix, AZ 85028

iwurman@tullybailey.com
4809652245
Party name: Freddy Brown, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543