Docket for 23-1045
|
Dec 04 2023 | Application (23A524) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2024 to March 20, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main Document | Dec 13 2023 | Application (23A524) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 20, 2024. | | | Mar 19 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 22, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 16 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent South Burlington, VT, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 17 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024. | | | Apr 18 2024 | Response Requested. (Due May 20, 2024) | | | Apr 24 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2024 to June 19, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 26 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 20, 2024. See Rule 30.1. | | |
|