Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-976
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-976
Title:Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al., Petitioners
v.
Michael Cargill
Docketed:April 7, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-51016)
   Decision Date:January 6, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 06 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 8, 2023)
PetitionProof of Service
Apr 24 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 8, 2023 to June 7, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 25 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 7, 2023.
May 08 2023Brief amici curiae of Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2023Brief of respondent Michael Cargill in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Jun 21 2023Reply of petitioners Merrick B. Garland, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 02 2023Rescheduled.
Sep 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023.
Sep 28 2023Rescheduled.
Oct 04 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023.
Nov 03 2023Petition GRANTED.
Dec 18 2023Brief of petitioners Merrick B. Garland, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Patrick J. Charles filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Brief amici curiae of Chicago, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2023Brief amici curiae of American Medical Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2023Brief amicus curiae of FAMM in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 26 2023Brief amici curiae of The District of Columbia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, February 28, 2024.
Jan 10 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit.
Jan 10 2024Motion for an extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 11 2024CIRCULATED.
Jan 12 2024Motion to extend the time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2024.
Jan 18 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Jan 18 2024Record requested from the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas.
Jan 22 2024Brief of respondent Michael Cargill filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2024Brief amici curiae of Second Amendment Law Center, Second Amendment Defense and Education Coalition, Federal Firearms Licensees of Illinois, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., and Guns Save Life filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2024Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2024Brief amici curiae of Senator Cynthia Lummis, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amicus curiae of FPC Action Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amicus curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amicus curiae of Manhattan Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 29 2024Brief amici curiae of National Association for Gun Rights, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amici curiae of The Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Rifle Association of America, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Record received from the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. The record is electronic and is available with the Clerk.
Feb 16 2024Reply of petitioners Merrick B. Garland, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Argued. For petitioners: Brian H. Fletcher, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Jonathan F. Mitchell, Austin, Tex.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Michael Cargill
Markham Sterling ChenowethNew Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

mark.chenoweth@ncla.legal
2028695210
Party name: Michael Cargill
Richard A. SampNew Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rasamp@verizon.net
202-869-5210
Party name: Michael Cargill
Other
Theodore Mark Cooperstein
    Counsel of Record
Theodore Cooperstein PLLC
1888 Main Street
Suite C-203
Madison, MS 39110

ted@appealslawyer.us
6013972471
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

DDEBOLD@GIBSONDUNN.COM
2029558551
Party name: FAMM
Michael John Dell
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

mdell@kramerlevin.com
212-715-9129
Party name: American Medical Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians and American College of Surgeons
Erin Marie ErhardtNational Rifle Assocation of America
11250 Waples Mill Road
Fairfax, VA 22030

eerhardt@nrahq.org
7205844578
Party name: National Rifle Association of America, Inc.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
Greenlee Law, PLLC
PO Box 4061
McCall, ID 83638

joseph@greenlee.law
(208) 271-2494
Party name: FPC Action Foundation
Lawrence Bradfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur, LLP
41 South High Street
Suite 3000
Columbus, OH 43215

bhughes@porterwright.com
6142272053
Party name: Patrick J. Charles
Myriam Zreczny Kasper
    Counsel of Record
City of Chicago Department of Law
2 N. LaSalle Street
Suite 580
Chicago, IL 60602

MYRIAM.KASPER@CITYOFCHICAGO.ORG
312-744-3564
Party name: CITY OF CHICAGO
David Benjamin Kopel
    Counsel of Record
Independence Institute
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
3032796536
Party name: Senators Cynthia Lummis, Mike Lee, et al.; Professors of Second Amendment Law; Independence Institute
C. D. Michel
    Counsel of Record
Michel & Associates, P.C.
180 East Ocean Blvd., Suite 200
Long Beach, CA 90802

CMICHEL@MICHELLAWYERS.COM
(562) 216-4444
Party name: Second Amendment Law Center, Second Amendment Defense and Education Coalition, Federal Firearms Licensees of Illinois, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., and Guns Save Life
George Attila MocsaryUniversity of Wyoming College of Law
1000 East University Avenue
Laramie, WY 82071

gmocsary@uwyo.edu
3077665262
Party name: Senators Cynthia Lummis, Mike Lee, et al.; Professors of Second Amendment Law; Independence Institute
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

ERIN.MURPHY@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.
Stephen Joseph Obermeier
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

SOBERMEIER@WILEY.LAW
2027197465
Party name: The Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition and Palmetto State Armory, LLC
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

WJO@MINDSPRING.COM
7033565070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, et al.
Glenn Evans Roper
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
1745 Shea Center Dr., Suite 400
Highlands Ranch, CO 80129

GEROPER@PACIFICLEGAL.ORG
(916) 503-9045
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Manhattan Institute
52 Vanderbilt Ave.
New York, NY 10017

ishapiro@manhattan-institute.org
212599-7000
Party name: Manhattan Institute
Ian Simmons
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye St., NW
Washington, DC 20006-4001

ISIMMONS@OMM.COM
202-383-5300
Party name: Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, and Everytown for Gun Safety
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

DTHOMPSON@COOPERKIRK.COM
202-220-9600
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
David Christian Tryon
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Columbus, OH 43215

d.tryon@buckeyeinstitute.org
6142244422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Caroline Sage Van Zile
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General for D.C.
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

caroline.vanzile@dc.gov
(202) 724-6609
Party name: The District of Columbia et al.
David Alan Warrington
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group, Inc.
2121 Eisenhower Avenue
Suite 608
Alexandria, VA 22314

dwarrington@dhillonlaw.com
7035741206
Party name: National Association for Gun Rights, Inc., the National Foundation for Gun Rights, Inc. and Rare Breed Triggers, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543