Docket for 22-6852 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Feb 21 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 27, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Mar 21 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2023 to April 26, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 26, 2023. | | | Apr 12 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 26, 2023 to May 24, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 13 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 24, 2023. | | | May 24 2023 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | Jun 06 2023 | Reply of petitioner Marvin Gabrion filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Jun 07 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023. | | | Jun 26 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|