Docket for 22-6822 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 18 2022 | Application (22A450) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2022 to January 27, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main Document | Nov 22 2022 | Application (22A450) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 27, 2023. | | | Feb 15 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 23, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Mar 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 23, 2023 to April 24, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 20 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2023. | | | Apr 20 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 24, 2023 to May 24, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 24 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 24, 2023. | | | May 19 2023 | Brief of respondent Idaho in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 07 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023. | | | Jun 26 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|