Docket for 22-6739 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 20 2022 | Application (22A566) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 5, 2023 to March 6, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 23 2022 | Application (22A566) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 7, 2023. | | | Feb 07 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 13, 2023) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Mar 06 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2023 to April 12, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 07 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 12, 2023. | | | Apr 03 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2023 to April 28, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 04 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 28, 2023. | | | Apr 28 2023 | Brief of respondent Ricky D. Dixon Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 17 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/1/2023. | | | Jun 05 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|