Docket for 22-5476 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 15 2022 | Application (21A837) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 28, 2022 to August 27, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 21 2022 | Application (21A837) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 27, 2022. | | | Aug 26 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 29, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Sep 29 2022 | Brief of respondents Bryan Stirling, Commissioner, South Carolina Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 11 2022 | Reply of petitioner John Wood filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 13 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022. | | | Oct 31 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|