Docket for 22-5463 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 15 2022 | Application (22A52) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 27, 2022 to August 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jul 21 2022 | Application (22A52) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 26, 2022. | | | Aug 24 2022 | Petition for Writ of Certiorari of Rahmael Holt not accepted for filing. (August 29, 2022) | | | Aug 24 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 28, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Sep 28 2022 | Brief of respondent Pennsylvania in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 12 2022 | Reply of petitioner Rahmael Sal Holt filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Oct 13 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022. | | | Oct 31 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|