Docket for 22-5236 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 06 2022 | Application (21A803) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 27, 2022 to July 27, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jun 06 2022 | Application (21A803) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 27, 2022. | | | Jul 27 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 31, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Aug 22 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 31, 2022 to September 30, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 23 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 30, 2022. | | | Sep 19 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2022 to October 31, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 20 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 31, 2022. | | | Oct 31 2022 | Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 14 2022 | Reply of petitioner George E. McFarland filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 16 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/2/2022. | | | Dec 05 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|