Docket for 21-8042 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 31 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 5, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jul 05 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2022 to July 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 06 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 18, 2022. | | | Jul 18 2022 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 04 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. | | | Oct 03 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|