SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-7455 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-7455 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Don'te Lamont McDaniel, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
March 24, 2022
Linked with 21A316
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S171393)
Decision Date:
August 26, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
October 20, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 07 2022
Application (21A316) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 18, 2022 to March 19, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 12 2022
Application (21A316) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 19, 2022.
Mar 21 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 25, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Proof of Service
Mar 30 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2022 to May 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 31 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 25, 2022.
May 25 2022
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jun 08 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 08 2022
Reply of petitioner Don'te Lamont McDaniel filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 27 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elias Paul Batchelder
Counsel of Record
Office of the State Public Defender
1111 Broadway, 10th Floor
Oakland, CA 94131
elias.batchelder@ospd.ca.gov
5102673330
Party name: Don'te Lamont McDaniel
Attorneys for Respondent
Dana Muhammad Ali
Counsel of Record
California Dept. of Justice
Office of the Attorney General
300 South Spring Street
Los Angeles, CA 90013
dana.ali@doj.ca.gov
2132696067
Party name: California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##