Docket for 21-6550 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 10 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 6, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | Nov 12 2021 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Wade Lay filed. | | Main Document | Jan 06 2022 | Brief of respondent Aboutanaa El Habti, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 20 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022. | | | Feb 22 2022 | Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|