Docket for 21-5711 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 13 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 20, 2021) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | Sep 30 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 20, 2021 to November 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 01 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 19, 2021. | | | Nov 18 2021 | Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 02 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022. | | | Dec 02 2021 | Reply of petitioner Irving Alexander Ramirez filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Jan 10 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|