Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-994
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-994
Title:Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
The Environmental Protection Commission of Hillsborough County, Florida, et al.
Docketed:January 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15937)
   Decision Date:June 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 24, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2021Waiver of right of respondent The Environmental Protection Commission of Hillsborough County, Florida, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 04 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 16 2021Response Requested. (Due March 18, 2021)
Feb 16 2021Brief amici curiae of International Organization of Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, European Automobile Manufacturers’ Association, and European Association of Automotive Suppliers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 16 2021Brief amici curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. and the Motor & Equipment Manufacturers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 16 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Environmental Protection Agency Officials, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Alliance for Automotive Innovation and National Automobile Dealers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2021Brief of respondents The Environmental Protection Commission of Hillsborough County, Florida, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 06 2021Reply of petitioners Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 26 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert J. Giuffra Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

giuffrar@sullcrom.com
212-558-3121
Party name: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., et al.
Matthew D. Slater
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
2112 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20037

mslater@cgsh.com
(202) 974-1500
Party name: Robert Bosch LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Peter K. Stris
    Counsel of Record
Stris and Maher LLP
777 S. Figueroa Street
Suite 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

peter.stris@strismaher.com
2139956800
Party name: The Environmental Protection Commission of Hillsborough County, Florida, et al.
Other
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
Gateway Plaza
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mfitzgerald@mcguirewoods.com
804-775-4716
Party name: Former Environmental Board and Department of Justice Officials Jeffrey E. Holmstead, Ronald J. Tenpasm John B. Dunlap III, and Lynn Buhl
Nicole A. Saharsky
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

nsaharsky@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3052
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. and the Motor & Equipment Manufacturers Association
Elisabeth Susan Theodore
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

elisabeth.theodore@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5891
Party name: Alliance for Automotive Innovation and National Automobile Dealers Association
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
(202) 736-8270
Party name: International Organization of Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, European Automobile Manufacturers’ Association, and European Association of Automotive Suppliers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543