SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-8001 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-8001 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
In Re Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr., Petitioner
Docketed:
May 12, 2021
Linked with 20A165
Lower Ct:
Case Numbers:
Decision Date:
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 10 2021
Petition for writ of habeas corpus and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed.
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
May 10 2021
Application (20A165) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 19 2021
Letter of applicants received.
May 19 2021
Application (20A165) withdrawn.
May 21 2021
Brief of State of Idaho in opposition not accepted for filing. (May 21, 2021)
May 21 2021
Brief of respondent State of Idaho in opposition filed.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Jun 09 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 28 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Deborah Anne Czuba
Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Services of Idaho
702 W. Idaho St., Suite 900
Boise, ID 83702
Deborah_A_Czuba@fd.org
2083315530
Party name: Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
L. LaMont Anderson
Counsel of Record
Idaho Attorney General's Office
700 W. State Street, 4th Floor
Boise, ID 83720-0010
lamont.anderson@ag.idaho.gov
208-334-4542
Party name: State of Idaho
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##