SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-7687 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-7687 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Ronald James Hamilton, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:
April 7, 2021
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
Case Numbers:
(WR-78,114-02)
Decision Date:
November 11, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 01 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 7, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Apr 30 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 7, 2021 to June 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 03 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 7, 2021. See Rule 30.1.
Jun 07 2021
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 18 2021
Reply of petitioner Ronald Hamilton, Jr. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 24 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan David Landers
Counsel of Record
Jonathan Landers, Attorney at Law
917 Franklin, Suite 300
Houston, TX 77002
jlanders.law@gmail.com
713-685-5000
Party name: Ronald Hamilton, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen Matthew Hoffman
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711
stephen.hoffman@oag.texas.gov
5129366388
Party name: Texas
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##