Docket for 20-6386 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 16 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 21, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Nov 25 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 21, 2020 to January 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 27 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 20, 2021. | | | Jan 13 2021 | Brief of respondent The State of Nevada in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 19 2021 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from January 28, 2021 to February 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 21 2021 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until February 18, 2021 granted. | | | Feb 11 2021 | Reply of petitioner James Walker filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 18 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021. | | | Mar 08 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|