Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-138
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-138
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
Sierra Club, et al.
Docketed:August 7, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-16102, 19-16300)
   Decision Date:June 26, 2020
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Sep 01 2020Letter of September 1, 2020 from the Acting Solicitor General filed.
Main Document
Sep 01 2020Motion of respondents California and New Mexico to extend the time to file a response from September 8, 2020 to September 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 02 2020Response to motion from petitioner Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Main Document
Sep 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 16, 2020, for all respondents.
Sep 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Rep. Andy Barr filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of The American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020Brief of respondents Sierra Club & Southern Border Communities Coalition in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020Brief of respondents California and New Mexico in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Sep 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Sep 24 2020Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 19 2020Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joshua A. Klein
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice - Office of the Solicitor General
1515 Clay Street
Suite 2000
Oakland, CA 94612-1413

joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
510-879-0756
Party name: California and New Mexico
Dror Ladin
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Fundation
125 Broad Street, Fl 18
New York, NY 10004

dladin@aclu.org
2122847303
Party name: Sierra Club & Southern Border Communities Coalition
Other
Richard Peter Hutchison
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
3100 Broadway
Suite 1200
Kansas City, MO 64111

pete.hutch@landmarklegal.org
8169315559
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Rep. Andy Barr
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2022485407
Party name: The American Center for Law and Justice

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543