SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-1136 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-1136 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Peter Capote, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:
February 19, 2021
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
Case Numbers:
(CR-17-0963)
Decision Date:
January 10, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
May 22, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
September 18, 2020
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 16 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 22, 2021)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 15 2021
Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 25 2021
Reply of petitioner Peter Capote filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Shechtman
Counsel of Record
Bracewell LLP
1251 Avenue of the Americas
49th Floor
New York, NY 10020
paul.shechtman@bracewell.com
212-508-6107
Party name: Peter Capote
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Dearman Anderson
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Alabama
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130
richard.anderson@alabamaag.gov
3343532021
Party name: State of Alabama
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##