Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-767
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-767
Title:National Association for Gun Rights, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Jeff Mangan, in His Official Capacity as the Commissioner of Political Practices for the State of Montana, et al.
Docketed:December 16, 2019
Linked with 19A478
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-35010)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2019Application (19A478) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 10, 2019 to December 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 31 2019Application (19A478) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 12, 2019.
Dec 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 15, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Randy Elf filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2020Waiver of right of respondent Jeff Mangan to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Jan 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Response Requested. (Due February 20, 2020)
Feb 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2020 to March 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 27, 2020.
Mar 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2020 to April 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 09 2020Letter of March 9, 2020 from counsel for respondent filed.
Main Document
Mar 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 27, 2020.
Apr 27 2020Brief of respondent Jeff Mangan, in His Official Capacity as the Commissioner of Political Practices for the State of Montana, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 11 2020Reply of petitioner National Association For Gun Rights, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
Jun 01 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Alan Warrington
    Counsel of Record
Kutak Rock LLP
1625 Eye Street NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

david.warrington@kutakrock.com
2028282437
Party name: National Association For Gun Rights, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Thompson Cochenour
    Counsel of Record
State of Montana - Department of Justice Attorney General's Office
215 North Sanders; PO Box 201401
Helena, MT 59601

mcochenour2@mt.gov
406-444-2026
Party name: Jeff Mangan
Other
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Free Speech Coalition, et al.
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 801
Washington, DC 20036

adickerson@ifs.org
(202) 301-9000
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Randolph Scott Elf
    Counsel of Record
Post Office Box 525
Lakewood, NY 14750

ForEFilingOnly@gmail.com
2024232122
Party name: Randy Elf

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543