SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-6061 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-6061 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Phillip Jones, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:
September 25, 2019
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Ohio, Summit County
Case Numbers:
(28063)
Decision Date:
January 30, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
June 26, 2019
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 23 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 25, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Oct 23 2019
Brief of respondent State of Ohio in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 07 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Nov 25 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kimberly Sue Rigby
Counsel of Record
Office of the Ohio Public Defender
250 East Broad Street
Suite 1400
Columbus, OH 43215
kim.rigby@opd.ohio.gov
6144665394
Party name: Phillip Jones
Attorneys for Respondent
Jacquenette Susanne Corgan
Counsel of Record
Summit County Prosecutor's Office
53 University Ave.
6th Floor
Akron, OH 44308
jcorgan@prosecutor.summitoh.net
3306432800
Party name: State of Ohio
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##