Docket for 19-5820 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 03 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Sep 11 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2019 to November 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 16 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 6, 2019. | | | Oct 30 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2019 to November 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 01 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 27, 2019. | | | Nov 26 2019 | Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director, TDCJ-CID in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Dec 10 2019 | Reply of petitioner Charles Raby filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | Dec 12 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020. | | | Jan 13 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|