Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-277
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-277
Title:HSBC Holdings PLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Irving H. Picard
Docketed:August 30, 2019
Linked with 18A1241
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2992(L))
   Decision Date:February 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 3, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2019Application (18A1241) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 2, 2019 to August 30, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 30 2019Application (18A1241) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 30, 2019.
Aug 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2019 to October 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 30, 2019.
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Cayman Islands Government and the Government of the Virgin Islands filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Cayman Finance and Recovery and Insolvency Specialists Association of the Cayman Islands filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of RISA Bermuda filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of British Virgin Islands Restructuring Professionals filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas J. Moloney
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006-0000

tmoloney@cgsh.com
212-225-2460
Party name: HSBC Holdings plc, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, et al.
2000 K Street, N.W
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@robbinsrussell.com
2027754503
Party name: Irving H. Picard
Other
Jason Philip Gottlieb
    Counsel of Record
Morrison Cohen LLP
909 Third Avenuee
New York, NY 10022

jgottlieb@morrisoncohen.com
212-735-8600
Party name: Cayman Finance and Recovery and Insolvency Specialists Association of the Cayman Islands
Richard D. Klingler
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

rklingler@sidley.com
202-736-8063
Party name: Cayman Islands Government and the Government of the Virgin Islands
S. Christopher Provenzano
    Counsel of Record
Provenzano Granne & Bader LLP
1330 Avenue of the Americas
Suite 23A
New York, NY 10019

chris.provenzano@pgbfirm.com
2128593516
Party name: RISA Bermuda
Daniel Martin Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

dsullivan@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: BRITISH VIRGIN ISLANDS RESTRUCTURING PROFESSIONALS
Jeffrey A. Udell
    Counsel of Record
Walden Macht & Haran LLP
One Battery Park Plaza
34th Floor
New York, NY 10004

judell@wmhlaw.com
2123352300
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543