SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-9270 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-9270 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Manuel Antonio Rodriguez, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
May 15, 2019
Linked with 18A902
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC18-1042)
Decision Date:
December 13, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
December 28, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 01 2019
Application (18A902) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 28, 2019 to May 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Mar 07 2019
Application (18A902) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 12, 2019.
May 13 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 14, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Jun 11 2019
Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 27 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jun 28 2019
Reply of petitioner Manuel Rodriguez filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 07 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marie-Louise Samuels Parmer
Counsel of Record
Office of the Capital Collateral Regional Counsel South
1 East Broward boulevard, Suite 444
Fort lauderdale, Florida, FL 33301
marie@samuelsparmerlaw.com
813-732-3321
Party name: Manuel Rodriguez
Attorneys for Respondent
Leslie Teresa Campbell
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1515 North Flagler Drive, Suite 900
West Palm Beach, FL 33401
Leslie.Campbell@myfloridalegal.com
561-268-5201
Party name: Manuel Rodriguez
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##