SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-8992 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-8992 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Charles Lorraine, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:
April 25, 2019
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Ohio, Trumbull County
Case Numbers:
(2017-T-0028)
Decision Date:
August 20, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
January 23, 2019
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 23 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 28, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
May 15 2019
Brief of respondent State of Ohio in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 29 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Randall L. Porter
Counsel of Record
Ohio Public Defender Comm.
250 East Broad Street
14th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215-0000
Randall.Porter@opd.ohio.gov
6144665394
Party name: Charles Lorraine
Attorneys for Respondent
Charles LeRoy Morrow
Counsel of Record
Trumbull County Prosecuting Attorney
160 High St, NW, 4th Floor
Warren, OH 44481-1092
psmorrow@co.trumbull.oh.us
3306752426
Party name: State of Ohio
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##