SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-855
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-855
Title:
Ray Allen, Secretary, Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development, et al., Petitioners
v.
International Association of Machinists District Ten, et al.
Docketed:
January 4, 2019
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(17-1178)
Decision Date:
September 13, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
November 21, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 28 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 4, 2019)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 09 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 4, 2019 to March 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 14 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 6, 2019.
Feb 01 2019
Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 04 2019
Brief amicus curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 04 2019
Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 04 2019
Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 01 2019
Brief of respondents International Association of Machinists District 10, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 20 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 10 2019
Rescheduled.
Apr 15 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.
Apr 17 2019
Rescheduled.
Apr 19 2019
Stipulation to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46.1 received.
Main Document
Apr 19 2019
Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Anthony David Russomanno
Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707
russomannoad@doj.state.wi.us
6082672230
Party name: Ray Allen, Secretary, Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jill Marie Hartley
Counsel of Record
The Previant Law Firm, S.C.
310 W. Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 100MW
Milwaukee, WI 53203
jh@previant.com
414-223-0428
Party name: International Association of Machinists District 10, et al.
Other
Richard Michael Esenberg
Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
Bloodgood House, 1139 E. Knapp Street
Milwaukee, WI 53202
rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
Thomas M. Fisher
Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204
tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Georgia, Louisiana, Oklahoma. South Carolina, and Texas
Amanda Kae Freeman
Counsel of Record
The National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160
akf@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
Erin Elizabeth Wilcox
Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814
ewilcox@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##