SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-7809 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-7809 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
James Were, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:
February 7, 2019
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Ohio
Case Numbers:
(2006-1578)
Decision Date:
November 7, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 11, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Feb 28 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2019 to April 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 04 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 10, 2019.
Apr 09 2019
Brief of respondent State of Ohio in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 24 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kathryn Keane Polonsky
Counsel of Record
Office of the Ohio Public Defender
250 E. Broad St., Suite 1400
Columbus, OH 43215
kathryn.polonsky@opd.ohio.gov
6144665394
Party name: James Were
Attorneys for Respondent
Brenda Stacie Leikala
Counsel of Record
Office of the Ohio Attorney General
150 E. Gay Street, 16th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215
brenda.leikala@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6149951930
Party name: State of Ohio
Ronald W. Springman Jr.
Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office
Hamilton County Prosecutor's Office
230 East Ninth Street, Suite 4000
Cincinnati, OH 45202
ron.springman@hcpros.org
513-946-3052
Party name: State of Ohio
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##