Docket for 18-7643 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 16 2018 | Application (18A533) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2018 to January 27, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 20 2018 | Application (18A533) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 27, 2019. | | | Jan 25 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 28, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Feb 22 2019 | Brief of State of Florida in opposition not accepted for filing. (February 22, 2019) (Corrected electronic version submitted) | | | Feb 22 2019 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | Mar 14 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019. | | | Apr 01 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|