SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-7547 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-7547 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Michael Joseph Mulder, Petitioner
v.
Nevada
Docketed:
January 24, 2019
Linked with 18A610
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Nevada
Case Numbers:
(69490)
Decision Date:
July 26, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
September 21, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2018
Application (18A610) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 20, 2018 to January 20, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Dec 11 2018
Application (18A610) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 20, 2019.
Jan 18 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 25, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Proof of Service
Feb 19 2019
Brief of respondent The State of Nevada in opposition filed.
Main Document
Main Document
Mar 07 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 08 2019
Reply of petitioner Michael Joseph Mulder filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 25 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Heather Fraley
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender Dist. of NV
411 E BONNEVILLE AVE
Suite 250
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Heather_Fraley@fd.org
7023886577
Party name: Michael Joseph Mulder
Attorneys for Respondent
Steven S. Owens
Counsel of Record
Office of the Clark County District Attorney
Clark County District Attorney
200 Lewis Ave., Box 552212
Las Vegas, NV 89155-2212
steven.owens@clarkcountyda.com
702-671-2750
Party name: The State of Nevada
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##