SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-7224 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-7224 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Jose Alejandro Acuna Valenzuela, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:
January 3, 2019
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Arizona
Case Numbers:
(CR-14-0351-AP)
Decision Date:
September 25, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 4, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Feb 04 2019
Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 21 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kerri L. Chamberlin
Counsel of Record
Office of the Legal Advocate
222 N. Central Ave.
Suite 154
Phoenix, AZ 85004
chamberlink@mail.maricopa.gov
4802417916
Party name: Jose Alejandro Acuna Valenzuela
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew Stuart Reilly
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005
Phoenix, AZ 85007
Andrew.Reilly@azag.gov
6025428573
Party name: Arizona
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##