SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-6708 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-6708 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Clifford D. Williams, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:
November 15, 2018
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Ohio, Butler County
Case Numbers:
(CA2017-07-105)
Decision Date:
April 9, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
August 15, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 13 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 17, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Dec 14 2018
Brief of respondent State of Ohio in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 03 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 22 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard A. Cline
Counsel of Record
Office of the Ohio Public Defender
250 East Broad Street, Suite 1400
Columbus, OH 43215
richard.cline@opd.ohio.gov
6144665394
Party name: Clifford Williams
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Thomas Gmoser
Counsel of Record
315 High Street, 11th Floor
Hamilton, OH 45011
gmosermt@butlercountyohio.org
5138873474
Party name: State of Ohio
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##