Docket for 18-6409 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 01 2018 | Application (18A148) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 20, 2018 to October 19, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | Aug 09 2018 | Application (18A148) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 19, 2018. | | | Oct 19 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 23, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Oct 30 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 23, 2018 to December 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 08 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 24, 2018. | | | Nov 21 2018 | Brief amici curiae of CHILD USA, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 21 2018 | Brief of respondent Benjamin Ford, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Jan 07 2019 | Reply of petitioner Scotty Garnell Morrow filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 10 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019. | | | Feb 19 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|