Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-422
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-422
Title:Robert A. Rucho, et al., Appellants
v.
Common Cause, et al.
Docketed:October 3, 2018
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(1:16-CV-1026)
   Decision Date:August 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2018Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due November 2, 2018)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Common Cause, et al..
Blanket Consent
Oct 30 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Robert A. Rucho, et al..
Blanket Consent
Oct 31 2018Motion to affirm filed by appellees League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of Philip P. Kalodner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2018Motion to affirm filed by appellees Common Cause, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Nov 05 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al..
Blanket Consent
Nov 08 2018Supplemental brief of appellees Common Cause, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Nov 20 2018Brief opposing motion to affirm from appellants Robert A. Rucho, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Rescheduled.
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 04 2019Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction is POSTPONED to the hearing of the case on the merits. The case will be set for argument in the March argument session.
Jan 08 2019Appellants' briefs on the merits are to be filed on or before Friday, February 8, 2019. Appellees' briefs on the merits are to be filed on or before Monday, March 4, 2019. Reply briefs on the merits are to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3 of the Rules of this Court. Amicus curiae briefs in support of appellants or in support of neither party are to be filed on or before Tuesday, February 12, 2019. Amicus curiae briefs in support of appellees are to be filed on or before Friday, March 8, 2019.
Jan 25 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 26, 2019
Jan 30 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Robert A. Rucho, et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 05 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Common Cause, et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 05 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 05 2019Motion for divided argument filed by appellees Common Cause, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 08 2019Joint appendix (2 volumes) filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Feb 08 2019Brief of appellants Robert A. Rucho, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of David Orentlicher in support of neither party filed (also in 18-726).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Republican Redistricting Trust filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of the American Civil Rights Union and Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of The Republican National Committee and the National Republican Congressional Committee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress from the North Carolina Delegation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Texas House Representative Carl Isett filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Speaker Michael C. Turzai filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Bernard Grofman and Ronald Keith Gaddie in support of neither party filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of The Wisconsin State Senate and Wisconsin State Assembly filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2019CIRCULATED
Feb 15 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Robert A. Rucho, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Emmet J Bondurant II
    Counsel of Record
Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, LLP
3900 One Atlantic Center
1201 W. Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309

bondurant@bmelaw.com
404-881-4100
Party name: Common Cause, et al.
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1411 K Street, NW, Suite 1400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al.
Other
Philip P. Kalodner
    Counsel of Record
Philip P Kalodner
208 Righters Mill Rd
208 Righters Mill Rd
Gladwyne, PA 19035

pkalodner@aol.com
610-649-8749
Party name: Philip P Kalodner
Efrem M. Braden
    Counsel of Record
Baker &Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue NW
Suite1100
Washington, DC 20036

mbraden@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1500
Party name: Speaker Michael C. Turzai
Edward Dean Greim
    Counsel of Record
Graves Garrett LLC
1100 Main Street, Suite 2700
Kansas City, MO 64105

edgreim@gravesgarrett.com
816-256-4144
Party name: The National Republican Redistricting Trust
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: States of Texas, Alabama, Arkansas, Georgia, Indiana, Louisiana, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, and Utah
Adam Karl Mortara
    Counsel of Record
Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar and Scott LLP
54 W. Hubbard Street
Chicago, IL 60654

adam.mortara@bartlit-beck.com
7737507154
Party name: The Wisconsin State Senate and Wisconsin State Assembly
Joseph M. Nixon
    Counsel of Record
The Nixon Law Firm P.C.
6363 Woodway
suite 800
Houston, TX 77057

joe@nixonlawtx.com
713-55-7535
Party name: Honorable Carl Isset
David Orentlicher
    Counsel of Record
UNLV William S. Boyd School of Law
4505 S. Maryland Parkway
Box 451003
Las Vegas, NV 89154-1003

dorentli@gmail.com
702-895-2333
Party name: David Orentlicher
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: American Civil Rights Union and Southeastern Legal Foundation
Kaylan Lytle Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington, Suite 1675
Indianapolis,, IN 46204

kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org
3172035599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation
Robert D. Popper
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

rpopper@judicialwatch.org
202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and AEF
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Bernard Grofman and Ronald Keith Gaddie
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: The Republican National Committee and the National Republican Congressional Committee
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
One North Wacker Drive
Suite 2905
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
312-759-5947
Party name: Members of Congress from the North Carolina Delegation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543