Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-179
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-179
Title:John Goodman, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:August 9, 2018
Linked with 17A1311
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fourth District
   Case Numbers:(4D14-4479)
   Decision Date:July 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 25, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 9, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 23 2018Application (17A1311) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 7, 2018 to August 6, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
May 30 2018Application (17A1311) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 6, 2018.
Aug 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 10, 2018)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Waiver of right of respondent State of Florida to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Robert Ufferman
    Counsel of Record
Michael Ufferman Law Firm, P.A.
2022-1 Raymond Diehl Road
Tallahassee, FL 32308

ufferman@uffermanlaw.com
8503862345
Party name: John Goodman
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Chambers Valuntas
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General
1515 N. Flalger Drive, Suite 900
West Palm Beach, FL 33401

richard.valuntas@myfloridalegal.com
5618375016
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543