Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1195
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1195
Title:Kendra Espinoza, et al., Petitioners
v.
Montana Department of Revenue, et al.
Docketed:March 14, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Montana
   Case Numbers:(DA 17-0492)
   Decision Date:December 12, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2019 to May 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2019.
Apr 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of Agudath Israel of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of Alliance for Choice in Education filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Honorable Scott Walker filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Jerry and Kathy Armstrong, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Brief amici curiae of EdChoice, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Motion of Pioneer Institute for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (April 18, 2019 -- Corrected version submitted)
Apr 12 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pioneer Institute, Inc. (4/18/2019)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 12 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Georgia Goal Scholarship Program, Inc.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Arizona Christian School Tuition Organization filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Montana Family Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Cato Institute.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 15 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Liberty Justice Center, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 15 2019Brief of respondents Montana Department of Revenue, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2019Reply of petitioners Kendra Espinoza, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Cato Institute GRANTED.
Jun 28 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Liberty Justice Center, et al. GRANTED.
Jun 28 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Georgia Goal Scholarship Program, Inc. GRANTED.
Jun 28 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pioneer Institute, Inc. GRANTED.
Jun 28 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jul 02 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including September 11, 2019.
Jul 16 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Kendra Espinoza, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 22 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Montana Department of Revenue, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 23 2019Motion for an extension of time to file respondents' brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file respondents' brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2019.
Sep 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 11 2019Brief of petitioners Kendra Espinoza, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Mackinac Center for Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pioneer Institute, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Opportunity Scholarship Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Brief amici curiae of EdChoice, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Honorable Scott Walker filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Brief amici curiae of Montana Catholic School Parents, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Amicus brief of American Federation for Children; Liberty Justice Center submitted.
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Senators Steve Daines, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Americans for Prosperity and yes. every kid. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Georgia Goal Scholarship Program, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Alliance for Choice in Education filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Independence Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Jerry and Kathy Armstrong, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Rusty Bowers, Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Center for Education Reform, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Montana Family Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Arizona Christian School Tuition Organization et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Amicus brief of Justice and Freedom Fund et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Amicus brief of Forge Youth Mentoring submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Amicus brief of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Amicus brief of 131 Current and Former State Legislators submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Richard Donen Komer
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

dkomer@ij.org
(703) 682-9320
Party name: Kendra Espinoza, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Daniel John Whyte
    Counsel of Record
Montana Department of Revenue
P.O. 7701
Helena, MT 59604

dwhyte@mt.gov
4064443340
Party name: Montana Department of Revenue, et al.
Other
Ethan Winfred Blevins
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

EBlevins@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Jerry and Kathy Armstrong, Lashawn Robinson, Gwendolyn Samuel, Yi Fang Chen, and Pacific Legal Foundation
Kimberlee Wood Colby
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society, et al.
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

kcolby@clsnet.org
703-894-1087
Party name: Christian Legal Society, United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Ethan Winfred Blevins
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

EBlevins@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Jerry and Kathy Armstrong, Association of Christian Schools International and Pacific Legal Foundation
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al.
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Center for Education Reform
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1875 Eye Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

cynthia.crawford@causeofaction.org
2024992421
Party name: Americans for Prosperity and yes. every kid.
Joshua Daniel Davey
    Counsel of Record
McGuire Woods LLP
201 North Tryon
Suite 3000
Charlotte, NC 28202

jdavey@mcguirewoods.com
(704) 343-2167
Party name: Forge Youth Mentoring
Thomas William Parker Douglas
    Counsel of Record
Douglas Law PLLC
106 East 8th Street
Holland, MI 49423

parkerdouglas66@gmail.com
801-699-7746
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Dwight Gerard Duncan
    Counsel of Record
333 Faunce Corner Road
North Dartmouth, MA 02747

dduncan@umassd.edu
508-985-1124
Party name: Pioneer Institute
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
330 East Kilbourn Ave., Suite 725
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: The Honorable Scott Walker
Steven Werner Fitschen
    Counsel of Record
National Legal Foundation
524 Johnstown Rd
Chesapeake, VA 23322

sfitschen@nationallegalfoundation.org
7574636133
Party name: 131 Current and Former State Legislators
Jason Peter Gosselin
    Counsel of Record
Drinker Biddle and Reath LLP
One Logan Square
Suite 2000
Philadelphia, PA 19103

jason.gosselin@dbr.com
2159882700
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Sarah Michelle Harris
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: Senators Steve Daines, Tim Scott, John Kennedy, and Marsha Blackburn and Representative Greg Gianforte
Leslie Davis Hiner
    Counsel of Record
EdChoice
111 Monument Circle, Suite 2658
lndianapolis, IN 46204

leslie@edchoice.org
317-681-0745
Party name: EdChoice
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Suite 208
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
714-614-0401
Party name: Justice and Freedom Fund et al.
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Avenue
Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3100
Party name: Arizona Christian School Tuition Organization and Immaculate Heart of Mary Catholic School
James Patrick Kelly III
    Counsel of Record
Solidarity Ctr./Law & Justice
3740 Davinci Court
Suite 375
Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

jamespkellyiii@gmail.com
770-828-4625
Party name: Georgia Goal Scholarship Program, Inc.
Brian Kirk Kelsey
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 S. LaSalle St., Suite 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

bkelsey@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-263-7668
Party name: American Federation for Children; Liberty Justice Center
Manuel S. Klausner
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Manuel S. Klausner
601 West Fifth Street
Eighth Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

mklausner@mac.com
2136170414
Party name: Reason Foundation and Individual Rights Foundation
David Benjamin Kopel
    Counsel of Record
Independence Institute
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
3032796536
Party name: Independence Institute
Mark J. Kurzmann
    Counsel of Record
Kurzmann Law Offices, P.C.
275 North Middletown Road
Suite 2D
Pearl River, NY 10965

mkurzmann@kurzmannlaw.com
917 864-6000
Party name: Agudath Israel of America
Fred A. Leibrock
    Counsel of Record
Phillips Murrah P.C.
101 N Robinson Av
Suite 1300
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

faleibrock@phillipsmurrah.com
4052354100
Party name: Opportunity Scholarship Fund
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Russell Charles MenyhartTaft Stettinius & Hollister
0ne lndiana Square. Ste 3500
lndianapolis, IN 46204

rmenyhart@taftlaw.com
3177133500
Party name: EdChoice
Anita Yvonne Milanovich
    Counsel of Record
Milanovich Law, PLLC
100 E Broadway Street
The Berkeley Room
Butte, MT 59701

aymilanovich@milanovichlaw.com
4065896856
Party name: Montana Family Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: Rusty Bowers, Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives, et al.
Andrea Marie Picciotti-Bayer
    Counsel of Record
Catholic Association Foundation
3220 N. Street NW, Suite 126
Washington, DC 20007

amariepicciotti@gmail.com
5712016564
Party name: Montana Catholic School Parents, et al.
Jeffrey Michael SchwabLiberty Justice Center
190 South LaSalle Street, Suite 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-263-7668
Party name: American Federation for Children; Liberty Justice Center
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E
.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute
Ian Seth Speir
    Counsel of Record
Nussbaum Speir PLLC
90 S. Cascade Ave
Suite 400
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

ian@nussbaumspeir.com
7194284937
Party name: Alliance for Choice in Education
Diana Marie Verm
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

dverm@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Patrick J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Mackinac Center for Public Policy
140 West Main Street
Midland, MI 48640

wright@mackinac.org
9894303912
Party name: Mackinac Center for Public Policy

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543