Docket for 17-9159 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 30 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 2, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jun 12 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 2, 2018 to August 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 14 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 1, 2018. | | | Jul 20 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 1, 2018 to August 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 24 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 31, 2018. | | | Aug 31 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Arkansas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOther | Sep 14 2018 | Reply of petitioner Bruce Ward filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 20 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018. | | | Oct 09 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|