SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-7865 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-7865 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Joseph C. Garcia, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:
February 23, 2018
Linked with 17A548
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(15-70039)
Decision Date:
July 21, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
September 22, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2017
Application (17A548) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 21, 2017 to February 19, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Nov 17 2017
Application (17A548) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 19, 2018.
Feb 20 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 26, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Mar 26 2018
Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed.
Main Document
Apr 09 2018
Reply of petitioner Joseph Garcia filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 12 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Karen Singer Smith
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
850 W. Adams St.
Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ 85007
karen_smith@fd.org
602-382-2816
Party name: Joseph Garcia
Attorneys for Respondent
Jefferson David Clendenin
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Texas
P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711-2548
jay.clendenin@oag.texas.gov
5124631416
Party name: Lorie Davis
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##