Docket for 17-7232 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 05 2017 | Application (17A394) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 22, 2017 to December 21, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | | Oct 12 2017 | Application (17A394) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 21, 2017. | | | Dec 20 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 1, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 01 2018 | Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 15 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018. | | | Mar 05 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|