Docket for 17-6255 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 20 2017 | Application (17A106) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 3, 2017 to October 2, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | | Jul 25 2017 | Application (17A106) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until October 2, 2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 6, 2017) | | | Nov 06 2017 | Brief of respondent McDaniel, Warden, et al. in opposition filed. | | | Nov 21 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017. | | | Nov 27 2017 | Reply of petitioner David S. Middleton filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 11 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|