Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1209
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1209
Title:Barclays PLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Joseph Waggoner, et al.
Docketed:February 28, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1912)
   Decision Date:November 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 5, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Barclays PLC, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 19 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Joseph Waggoner, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 23 2018Brief of respondents Joseph Waggoner, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Financial Economists and Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Former SEC Officials and Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2018Reply of petitioners Barclays PLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Thomas Scott
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

scottj@sullcrom.com
212-558-4000
Party name: Barclays PLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
    Counsel of Record
POMERANTZ LLP
600 Third Avenue, Floor 20
New York, NY 10016

jalieberman@pomlaw.com
212-661-1100
Party name: Joseph Waggoner, et al.
Other
David Sapir Lesser
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

David.Lesser@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8851
Party name: Former SEC Officials and Law Professors
David Rudolph Lurie
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of David R. Lurie, PLLC
194 President Street
Brooklyn, NY 11231

david@davidlurielaw.com
347-651-0194
Party name: Financial Economists and Legal Scholars
Michael H. Park
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
745 Fifth Avenue
Suite 500
New York, NY 10151

park@consovoymccarthy.com
212-247-8006
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543