Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1432
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1432
Title:Ashley Sveen, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kaye Melin
Docketed:June 1, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1172)
   Decision Date:April 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 3, 2017)
Jun 05 2017Waiver of right of respondent Kaye Melin to respond filed.
Jul 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Aug 01 2017Response Requested. (Due August 31, 2017)
Aug 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 29, 2017.
Sep 29 2017Brief of respondent Kaye Melin in opposition filed.
Oct 06 2017Reply of petitioners Ashley Sveen, et al. filed.
Oct 18 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Oct 23 2017Rescheduled.
Nov 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Dec 08 2017Petition GRANTED.
Dec 18 2017Letter from counsel for petitioners regarding case caption filed.
Main Document
Jan 16 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Ashley Sveen, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Jan 22 2018Brief of petitioners Ashley Sveen, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, March 19, 2018
Jan 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of American College of Trust and Estate Counsel filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2018CIRCULATED
Feb 21 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Feb 21 2018Brief of respondent Kaye Melin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professor James W. Ely, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of The Women’s Law Project, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit. (1 Box)
Mar 08 2018Reply of petitioners Ashley Sveen, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2018Argued. For petitioners: Adam G. Unikowsky, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Shay Dvoretzky, Washington, D. C.
Jun 11 2018Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Kagan, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Thomas, Ginsburg, Breyer, Alito, and Sotomayor, JJ., joined. Gorsuch, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
Jul 13 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

aunikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Ashley Sveen, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

(202)-879-3474
Party name: Kaye Melin
Robert John Lange7831 Glenroy Road
Suite 145
Bloomington, MN 55439-3115

Bob@LawyerBob.com
(952)-837-1900
Party name: Kaye Melin
Other
David A. Barrett
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner, LLP
575 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022

dbarrett@bsfllp.com
212-446-2300
Party name: The Women’s Law Project, et al.
Dana Berliner
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

dberliner@ij.org
(703) 682-9320
Party name: Professor James W. Ely, Jr.
Robert W. Goldman
    Counsel of Record
Goldman Felcoski & Stone, P.A.
850 Parkshore Drive
Suite 203
Naples, FL 34103

rgoldman@gfsestatelaw.com
239 436-1988
Party name: American College of Trust and Estate Counsel

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543