Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-6648
No. 15-6648     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
James Garrett Freeman, Petitioner
v.
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:October 26, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-70001)
  Decision Date:June 9, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 8 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 25, 2015)
Nov 24 2015 Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed.
Dec 10 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Michael B. Charlton P.O. Box 51075(541) 636-2793
    Counsel of RecordEugene, OR  97405
charltonlegal@gmail.com
Party name: James Garrett Freeman
Attorneys for Respondent:
Travis G. Bragg Assistant Attorney General of Texas(512) 936-1400
    Counsel of RecordP.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX  78711-2548
travis.bragg@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Party name: William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543